We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tomechak, Matthew ,
Tomechak, Natalie ,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
represented by
Spicker, Karen S ,
against
Citicorp Credit Services Inc ,
represented by
Schulman, Michael D ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Judge
Timothy M. Casserly
Filing Date
December 30, 2011
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Defendants
Citicorp Credit Services Inc
Case Events for
Tomechak, Matthew v. Citicorp Credit Services Inc
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
May 30, 2012
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/01/2012 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated.
May 03, 2012
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Tomechak, Matthew; Tomechak, Natalie. Refers to: Citicorp Credit Services Inc (USA)
May 02, 2012
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing SD Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/01/2012 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.
Get Document
March 06, 2012
Docket Event
Answer filed by Citicorp Credit Services Inc (USA). Refers to: Tomechak, Matthew; Tomechak, Natalie
February 08, 2012
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Tomechak, Matthew; Tomechak, Natalie. Refers to: Citicorp Credit Services Inc (USA)
February 08, 2012
Docket Event
Case Management Statement filed by Tomechak, Matthew; Tomechak, Natalie.
January 11, 2012
Docket Event
Original Summons (1ST AMENDED) filed by Tomechak, Matthew; Tomechak, Natalie. Refers to: Citicorp Credit Services Inc (USA)
January 11, 2012
Docket Event
Summons issued.
December 30, 2011
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by Tomechak, Matthew; Tomechak, Natalie. Refers to: Citicorp Credit Services Inc (USA)
December 30, 2011
Docket Event
Summons issued.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.