Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wolford, Sarah, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Quade, Michael W, against Stroh, Trent, Stroh, Shelby, Pacheco, Felicia, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Jacqueline M. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial175 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions342 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time557 days |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 03/15/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.
Date: 2012-06-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/02/2012 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2012-10-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/22/2012 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2012-06-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 03/22/2013 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2013-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2013-01-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 12/07/2012 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2012-12-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by Wolford, Sarah rejected on 07/05/2013.
Date: 2013-07-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/24/2013 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2013-01-24T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to STROH, SHELBY . | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Whitfield, S. Elizabeth . | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hair, Body and Sol, Inc.. | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to STROH, TRENT . | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Hair, Body and Sol, Inc.; Whitfield, Brian; Whitfield, S. Elizabeth; Wolford, Sarah. Refers to: STROH, SHELBY; STROH, TRENT; Pacheco, Felicia; Whitfield, Brian; Whitfield, S.; Hair, Body and Sol, Inc. | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hair, Body and Sol, Inc.. | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Pacheco, Felicia . | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Whitfield, Brian . | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Whitfield, S. Elizabeth . | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Whitfield, Brian . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.