Executive Financial Enterprises, Inc.,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Guerrini, John D,
against
Smith, Margaret J,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Executive Financial Enterprises, Inc. v. Smith, Margaret J
Case Events for
Executive Financial Enterprises, Inc. v. Smith, Margaret J
Date
Type
Description
January 31, 2013
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Executive Financial Enterprises, Inc.. Refers to: Smith, Margaret
January 30, 2013
Docket Event
OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 02/01/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-26 was vacated.
January 29, 2013
Docket Event
Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
January 29, 2013
Docket Event
Minute Order Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
January 19, 2013
Docket Event
OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed reassigned to for 02/01/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in N-26 at North County.
January 19, 2013
Docket Event
Case reassigned from N-03 to N-26 effective 01/19/2013.
December 27, 2012
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing SD OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 02/01/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 .
August 22, 2012
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Application for Entry of Judgment (COURT) submitted by Executive Financial Enterprises, Inc. rejected on 08/22/2012. Refers to: Smith, Margaret
August 14, 2012
Docket Event
Application for Entry of Judgment (COURT) filed by Executive Financial Enterprises, Inc.. Refers to: Smith, Margaret
April 16, 2012
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Application for Entry of Judgment (COURT) submitted by Executive Financial Enterprises, Inc. rejected on 04/16/2012. Refers to: Smith, Margaret