Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Exeter Fiduciary Services Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by D'Ambrosio, James A, against Pinzini, Michael, Peninsula Realtors, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with William R. Nevitt, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time2020 days |
Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 03/13/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-05 .
Date: 2012-02-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/25/2012 01:30:00 PM.
Date: July 25, 2012Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 03/13/2012 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2012-03-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.