Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Unigard Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lynch, Peter A, against Grohe America Inc, represented by Garchie, Peter L, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial176 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time2345 days |
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: October 05, 2011Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2011-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2011-06-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/05/2011 08:30:00 AM.
Date: October 05, 2011Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/24/2011 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2011-06-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.