Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cal-Prop Management Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Heinz, Jean M, against Stemple, Bonnie, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Joel M. Pressman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions201 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time2498 days |
Writ of Execution submitted by Cal-Prop Management Inc rejected on 10/18/2012.
Date: October 18, 2012Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2011-12-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Default Prove-Up Hearing heard 01/20/2012 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2012-01-20T00:00:00Writ of Execution submitted by Cal-Prop Management Inc rejected on 10/31/2012.
Date: October 31, 2012Judgment by Default by Court (REJECTED) submitted by Cal-Prop Management Inc rejected on 12/01/2011.
Date: 2011-12-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.