Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
United Services Automobile Association, filed a(n) Civil - Limited case represented by Karpel, Jeffrey E, against Antonio, Maria Angelica, Cruz Antonio, Florencia, represented by Buckley, Paul A, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Jeffrey B. Barton presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Time To Trial182 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time2498 days |
Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/28/2011 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2011-01-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney submitted by Cruz Antonio, Florencia rejected on 03/01/2011.
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 06/24/2011 08:45:00 AM.
Date: June 24, 2011Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: August 29, 2011Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: August 29, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.