Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Andrew W Allport vs. Wells Fargo Bank NA as trustee for the Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Throught Certificates Series 2007-4
On July 30, 2010 an other real property case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Jeffrey B. Barton presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 30, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
6 years, 10 months and 3 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Contents as of 05/31/17 - volume 1 of 1 | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Request For Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action received and filed on 2/17/2011. | |
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. |
|
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/07/2011 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Jeffrey B. Barton was vacated. | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 01/07/2011 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Jeffrey B. Barton was vacated. | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Allport, Andrew W. | |
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Notice of Conditional Settlement submitted by Allport, Andrew W rejected on 12/20/2010. |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/07/2011 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Jeffrey B. Barton. |
|
October 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case (RELATED CASE: 37-2009-97668) filed by Onewest Bank FSB. | |
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Demurrer filed by Onewest Bank FSB; Wells Fargo Bank NA as trustee for the Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Throught Certificates Series 2007-4. Refers to: Allport, Andrew | |
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 01/07/2011 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Jeffrey B. Barton. | |
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case (RELATED CASE: ALLPORT vs. ALLPORT (2009-97668)) filed by Onewest Bank FSB. | |
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service filed by Allport, Andrew W. | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Allport, Andrew W. Refers to: Indymac Mortgage Services | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Allport, Andrew W. Refers to: Onewest Bank FSB | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Allport, Andrew W. Refers to: Wells Fargo Bank NA as trustee for the Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Throught Certificates Series 2007-4 | |
August 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (OF RECORDING OF LIS PENDENS) filed by Allport, Andrew W. | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case (37-2009-97668 (ALLPORT vs. ALLPORT)) filed by Allport, Andrew W. | |
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Allport, Andrew W. Refers to: Wells Fargo Bank NA as trustee for the Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Throught Certificates Series 2007-4; Onewest Bank FSB; Indymac Mortgage Services | |
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Allport, Andrew W. Refers to: Wells Fargo Bank NA as trustee for the Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Throught Certificates Series 2007-4; Onewest Bank FSB; Indymac Mortgage Services | |
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Barton, Jeffrey.
Judge: Barton Jeffrey |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Allport, Andrew W. Refers to: Wells Fargo Bank NA as trustee for the Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Throught Certificates Series 2007-4; Onewest Bank FSB; Indymac Mortgage Services |