Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
North American Elite Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Tamchin, Stephen M; Werner, Philip, against San Diego Gas & Electric Company, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Richard E. L. Strauss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time2528 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Contents as of 05/31/17 - volume 1 of 1 | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to San Diego Gas & Electric Company. | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to NORTH AMERICAN ELITE INSURANCE COMPANY. | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Re: 2008-93082) filed by NORTH AMERICAN ELITE INSURANCE COMPANY. | |
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Cases consolidated on 07/01/2010. 37-2008-00093082-CU-NP-CTL is designated the lead case. | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.
Judge: Strauss Richard |
|
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint (ADOPTING 2007 WILDFIRE MASTER COMPLAINT 2008-93082) filed by NORTH AMERICAN ELITE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: San Diego Gas & Electric Company | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by NORTH AMERICAN ELITE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: San Diego Gas & Electric Company | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by NORTH AMERICAN ELITE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: San Diego Gas & Electric Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.