Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jp Morgan Chase Bank N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Reese, Harlan M, against Asbille, Danny R, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with John S. Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions218 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2528 days |
Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default heard 01/28/2011 10:15:00 AM.
Date: 2011-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: September 16, 2011Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Judgment heard 09/02/2011 10:15:00 AM.
Date: 2011-09-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Judgment heard 09/16/2011 10:15:00 AM.
Date: September 16, 2011OSC - Failure to File Judgment scheduled for 09/02/2011 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.
Date: 2011-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2011-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: September 16, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.