Romero, Lavina,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Handel, Kane,
against
Shongolo, Sheikh,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with Jeffrey B. Barton presiding.
Case Details for
Romero, Lavina v. Shongolo, Sheikh
Case Events for
Romero, Lavina v. Shongolo, Sheikh
Date
Type
Description
June 01, 2017
Docket Event
Case File Contents as of 05/31/17 - volume 1 of 1
March 28, 2012
Docket Event
Minute Order Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
March 28, 2012
Docket Event
Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.
February 22, 2012
Docket Event
Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
February 22, 2012
Docket Event
Minute Order Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
February 08, 2012
Docket Event
OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 03/16/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Jeffrey B. Barton was vacated.
February 02, 2012
Docket Event
OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 03/16/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Jeffrey B. Barton.
February 02, 2012
Docket Event
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD The OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default was rescheduled to 03/16/2012 at 11:00:00 AM in C-69 before Jeffrey B. Barton at Central.
January 05, 2012
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing SD OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 02/24/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Jeffrey B. Barton.
November 30, 2010
Docket Event
OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 02/18/2011 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Jeffrey B. Barton was vacated.