We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank South Dakota N A ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Moore, Harvey M ,
against
Morton, Amy Heather ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with William S. Cannon presiding.
Filing Date
December 30, 2010
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Plaintiffs
Citibank South Dakota N A
Case Events for
Citibank South Dakota N A v. Morton, Amy Heather
Date
Type
Description
April 29, 2011
Docket Event
OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 06/01/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon was vacated.
April 29, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Citibank South Dakota N A.
April 26, 2011
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing SD OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 06/01/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.
Get Document
January 03, 2011
Docket Event
Summons issued.
December 30, 2010
Docket Event
Complaint filed by Citibank South Dakota N A. Refers to: Morton, Amy
December 30, 2010
Docket Event
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.
Judge: Cannon William
December 30, 2010
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by Citibank South Dakota N A. Refers to: Morton, Amy
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.