Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalry Portfolio Services Llc As Assignee Of Cavalry Investments Llc As Assignee Of Mbna Fia Card Services Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Mosqueda, Elvira, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3754 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC as assignee of Cavalry Investments LLC as assignee of MBNA/FIA Card Services NA. Refers to: Mosqueda, Elvira | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Renewal) filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC as assignee of Cavalry Investments LLC as assignee of MBNA/FIA Card Services NA. Refers to: Mosqueda, Elvira | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Renewal of Judgment - Notice (Issued 7-24-2020) filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC as assignee of Cavalry Investments LLC as assignee of MBNA/FIA Card Services NA. Refers to: Mosqueda, Elvira | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Renewal of Judgment - Application for Entry (Renewed judgment total: $19343.63) filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC as assignee of Cavalry Investments LLC as assignee of MBNA/FIA Card Services NA. Refers to: Mosqueda, Elvira | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs: $70.00/Interest: $9308.47) filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC as assignee of Cavalry Investments LLC as assignee of MBNA/FIA Card Services NA. Refers to: Mosqueda, Elvira | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC as assignee of Cavalry Investments LLC as assignee of MBNA/FIA Card Services NA. | |
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. | |
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ***WRIT OF EXECUTION RECEIVED*** | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Cost: $70 Interest: $4894.76) filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC as assignee of Cavalry Investments LLC as assignee of MBNA/FIA Card Services NA. Refers to: Mosqueda, Elvira |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.