Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rymsza, Christina L, against Bishop, Jane S, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions188 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time310 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by American Express Bank FSB. | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | 2/14/11 RECEIVED CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT PKG | |
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Bishop, Jane | |
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Bishop, Jane S on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by American Express Bank FSB . | |
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Bishop, Jane | |
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Non Service) filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Bishop, Jane | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by American Express Bank, FSB. Refers to: Bishop, Jane | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department E-21. | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express Bank, FSB. Refers to: Bishop, Jane |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.