Capital One Bank,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Walsh, Mark D,
against
Ruvalcaba, Cristhian A,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Capital One Bank v. Ruvalcaba, Cristhian A
Case Events for
Capital One Bank v. Ruvalcaba, Cristhian A
Date
Type
Description
October 19, 2015
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. Refers to: Ruvalcaba, Cristhian
June 15, 2015
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned FULLY SATISFIED.
November 25, 2014
Docket Event
Writ of Execution issued.
November 04, 2014
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. Refers to: Ruvalcaba, Cristhian
May 19, 2011
Docket Event
Abstract of Judgment issued.
April 13, 2011
Docket Event
Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. Refers to: Ruvalcaba, Cristhian
April 13, 2011
Docket Event
Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Capital One Bank (USA) NA and against Ruvalcaba, Cristhian A for $ 1087.04, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 300.00, interest: $ 77.73, prejudgment costs: $ 289.50, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 1754.27.
April 12, 2011
Docket Event
Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. Refers to: Ruvalcaba, Cristhian
April 12, 2011
Docket Event
Application for Entry of Judgment (CLERK) filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. Refers to: Ruvalcaba, Cristhian
February 23, 2011
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Application for Entry of Judgment (CLERK) submitted by Capital One Bank (USA) NA rejected on 02/23/2011. Refers to: Ruvalcaba, Cristhian