We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Capital One Bank ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Moore, Harvey M ,
against
Mayorga, Isaac ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior.
Filing Date
June 21, 2010
Last Refreshed
August 05, 2023
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
102 days
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Case Cycle Time
3634 days
Case Events for
Capital One Bank v. Mayorga, Isaac
Date
Type
Description
June 02, 2020
Docket Event
Substitution of Attorney filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. Refers to: Capital One Bank (USA) NA
December 14, 2010
Docket Event
Abstract of Judgment issued.
October 01, 2010
Docket Event
Default entered as to Mayorga, Isaac on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA .
October 01, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. Refers to: Mayorga, Isaac
October 01, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment entered for Capital One Bank (USA) NA and against Mayorga, Isaac for a grand total of $ 2358.25.
September 27, 2010
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK DEFAULT AND APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
September 27, 2010
Docket Event
Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. Refers to: Mayorga, Isaac
September 07, 2010
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Application for Entry of Judgment submitted by Capital One Bank (USA) NA rejected on 09/07/2010.
Get Document
September 06, 2010
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
July 06, 2010
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. Refers to: Mayorga, Isaac
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.