We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Somerset House, Llc ,
filed a(n)
Unlawful Detainer -
Property
case
represented by
Relph, Christine M ,
against
Gardner, Christopher Neil ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
December 06, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
21 days
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Defendants
Gardner, Christopher Neil
Case Events for
Somerset House, Llc v. Gardner, Christopher Neil
Date
Type
Description
February 02, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Possession returned - Unsatisfied
January 21, 2011
Docket Event
Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Somerset House, LLC. Refers to: Gardner, Christopher
January 21, 2011
Docket Event
Judgment entered for Somerset House, LLC and against Gardner, Christopher Neil for a grand total of $ 0.00 .
January 21, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Possession issued.
January 12, 2011
Docket Event
Default entered as to Gardner, Christopher Neil on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Somerset House, LLC .
January 12, 2011
Docket Event
****CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED****
January 12, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants filed by Somerset House, LLC.
January 11, 2011
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants submitted by Somerset House, LLC rejected on 01/11/2011.
Get Document
December 27, 2010
Docket Event
****Clerk's Default Judgment Received****
December 27, 2010
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default filed by Somerset House, LLC. Refers to: Gardner, Christopher
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.