Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wish, Bill, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Richard, Fred P, against Gardner, Teresa, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions43 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time2583 days |
Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants submitted by Wish, Bill rejected on 01/05/2011.
Date: 2011-01-05T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 02/14/2011 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-05 .
Date: January 27, 2011Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 02/14/2011 01:30:00 PM.
Date: February 14, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.