We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Eagles Point Apartments ,
filed a(n)
Unlawful Detainer -
Property
case
represented by
Smith, Theadore M ,
against
Taylor, Theresa ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
June 21, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
35 days
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Case Cycle Time
2751 days
Case Events for
Eagles Point Apartments v. Taylor, Theresa
Date
Type
Description
January 01, 2018
Docket Event
Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Taylor, Theresa, on 07/01/2010, has expired.
July 27, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Possession issued.
July 26, 2010
Docket Event
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 07/26/2010 08:10:00 AM.
Get Document
July 26, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment - by Court - After Trial filed by Eagles Point Apartments. Refers to: Taylor, Theresa
July 26, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment rendered.
July 26, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment entered for Eagles Point Apartments and against Taylor, Theresa for a grand total of $ 4195.00 .
July 08, 2010
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing SD Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 07/26/2010 at 08:10:00 AM at North County in N-08 .
Get Document
July 07, 2010
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Eagles Point Apartments. Refers to: Taylor, Theresa
July 07, 2010
Docket Event
Request to Set Case for Trial (At Issue Memorandum) filed by Eagles Point Apartments. Refers to: Taylor, Theresa
July 01, 2010
Docket Event
Answer filed by Taylor, Theresa. Refers to: Eagles Point Apartments
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.