Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Conam Management Corporation, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Khalidy, Kareem M; Mendez, Alejandra, against Fowler, Valerie, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with John N. Blair presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 21, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions35 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time3225 days |
Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 06/28/2010 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-01 .
Date: 2010-06-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/17/2010 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2010-06-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 06/25/2010 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2010-06-25T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Conam Management Corporation. | |
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Conam Management Corporation. | |
January 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Fowler, Valerie, on 05/26/2010, has expired. | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (COST$115.00/INTEREST$2055.95) filed by Conam Management Corporation. | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Cost: $55 Interest: $1884.11) filed by Conam Management Corporation. Refers to: Fowler, Valerie | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED | |
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Conam Management Corporation. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.