Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Mortgage Services Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Endres, David R, against Baltazar, Jaime, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions20 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned - Unsatisfied filed by HSBC Mortgage Services Inc. Refers to: Baltazar, Jaime | |
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for HSBC Mortgage Services Inc and against Baltazar, Jaime for a grand total of $ 0.00 . | |
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. | |
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by HSBC Mortgage Services Inc. | |
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Baltazar, Jaime on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by HSBC Mortgage Services Inc . | |
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by HSBC Mortgage Services Inc. | |
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by HSBC Mortgage Services Inc. Refers to: Baltazar, Jaime | |
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by HSBC Mortgage Services Inc. | |
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by HSBC Mortgage Services Inc. | |
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by HSBC Mortgage Services Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.