We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank South Dakota Na ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Dawson, Angela C ,
against
Gonzalez, Beatriz O ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
March 04, 2009
Last Refreshed
November 04, 2020
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
1659 days
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Case Cycle Time
2962 days
Case Events for
Citibank South Dakota Na v. Gonzalez, Beatriz O
Date
Type
Description
April 13, 2017
Docket Event
Case File Contents as of 04/12/17 - volume 1 of 1
September 18, 2013
Docket Event
Case file location changed to Hall of Justice C-Civil Business Office (Rm 225)
September 18, 2013
Docket Event
Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.
September 18, 2013
Docket Event
Substitution of Attorney filed by Citibank South Dakota NA.
September 18, 2013
Docket Event
Minute Order Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 09/18/2013 08:30:00 AM.
Get Document
September 18, 2013
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Citibank South Dakota NA.
August 14, 2013
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing SD OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 09/18/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-05 .
Get Document
April 21, 2009
Docket Event
Stipulation and Order Paperwork Received.
April 21, 2009
Docket Event
Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Citibank South Dakota NA. Refers to: Gonzalez, Beatriz
April 09, 2009
Docket Event
Certificate of Service filed by Citibank South Dakota NA.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.