We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tran, Tam Thibang ,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with David G. Brown presiding.
Filing Date
December 29, 2009
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
November 02, 2020
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Other Parties
Self-Represented (Attorney)
Case Events for
Tran, Tam Thibang v.
Date
Type
Description
March 05, 2010
Docket Event
Decree Changing Name filed by Tran, Tam Thibang.
February 24, 2010
Docket Event
Petition for Change of Name filed by Tam Thibang Tran on behalf of Huy Nhat Ngo was granted.
February 24, 2010
Docket Event
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Hearing on Name Change heard 02/23/2010 08:30:00 AM.
Get Document
February 23, 2010
Docket Event
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Brown, David.
Judge: Brown David
December 29, 2009
Docket Event
Declaration - Other (DEATH CERTIFICATE OF BIOLOGICAL FATHER) filed by Tran, Tam Thibang.
December 29, 2009
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department N-03.
December 29, 2009
Docket Event
Petition for Change of Name (DEATH CERTIFICATE OF BIOLOGICAL FATHER) filed by Tran, Tam Thibang. Refers to: Ngo, Huy
December 29, 2009
Docket Event
Hearing on Name Change scheduled for 02/23/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 .
December 29, 2009
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tran, Tam Thibang. Refers to: Ngo, Huy
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.