Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nguyen, Huan T, against Alto, Michelle R, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 19, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions134 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time708 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED | |
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED | |
May 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. | |
October 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. | |
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. Refers to: Alto, Michelle | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. Refers to: Alto, Michelle | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Alto, Michelle R on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A. . | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Application for Entry of Judgment (CLERK) filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. Refers to: Alto, Michelle |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.