Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mcclenahan, Keenan E, against Hernandez, Aurelia A, represented by Shoemaker, Mark A, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Adrienne A. Orfield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdrienne A. Orfield Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions52 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time196 days |
Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment (UD) heard 05/28/2009 01:15:00 PM.
Date: 2009-05-28T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 04/30/2009 at 08:10:00 AM at North County in N-11 .
Date: 2009-04-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment (UD) heard 06/08/2009 01:15:00 PM.
Date: 2009-06-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment (UD) heard 05/28/2009 01:15:00 PM.
Date: 2009-05-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 04/30/2009 08:10:00 AM.
Date: 2009-05-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment (UD) heard 06/08/2009 01:15:00 PM.
Date: June 09, 2009Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 06/09/2009 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2009-06-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 06/30/2009 09:30:00 AM.
Date: June 30, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.