Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Amtrust Bank, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Jameson, Gayle E, against Workman, Allen, Workman, Luzvisa, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Roderick Ward Shelton presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 06, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions23 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time428 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event | OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed (Unlawful Detainer) scheduled for 08/06/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-19 Roderick W. Shelton was vacated. | |
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event | OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed (Unlawful Detainer) scheduled for 08/06/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-19 Roderick W. Shelton. | |
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Amtrust Bank. Refers to: Workman, Allen; Workman, Luzvisa | |
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (INCL ALL UKNOWNS) filed by Amtrust Bank. Refers to: Workman, Allen; Workman, Luzvisa | |
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. | |
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Amtrust Bank and against Workman, Allen ;Workman, Luzvisa for a grand total of $ 0.00 . | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Workman, AllenWorkman, Luzvisa on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Amtrust Bank . | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Application for Judgment for Restitution of Premises Only filed by Amtrust Bank. Refers to: Workman, Allen; Workman, Luzvisa | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Amtrust Bank. | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Workman, Allen on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Amtrust Bank . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.