Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arrow Financial Services Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Henriques, Janalie, against Maurer, Ronald D, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Adrienne A. Orfield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdrienne A. Orfield Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case reassigned from N-12 to N-03 effective 01/03/2009.
Date: 2009-01-05T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED | |
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Maurer, Ronald | |
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Maurer, Ronald | |
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. Refers to: Maurer, Ronald | |
April 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. | |
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND APPLICATION FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT RECEIVED 2/22/10. | |
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. Refers to: Maurer, Ronald | |
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. Refers to: Maurer, Ronald | |
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Application for Entry of Judgment (CLERK) filed by Arrow Financial Services, LLC. Refers to: Maurer, Ronald |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.