Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Nevada N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stebbins, Donald R, against Shanaberger, Richard W, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 14, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time3236 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Contents as of 02/28/17 - volume 1 of 1 | |
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. | |
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract papers received | |
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | The default filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A was entered as to Shanaberger, Richard W on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used. | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. Refers to: Shanaberger, Richard | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | ***Clerk's Judgment request received*** | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. Refers to: Shanaberger, Richard | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.