Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wiegand, F Byron, Bynolf, Anita M, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Gerschler, Anton C; Opolski, Leon A, against Motlagh, Susan C, Motlagh, Frank A, represented by Banner, Steven J, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Kenneth K. So presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial171 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time3268 days |
Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/08/2008 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2008-08-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/16/2008 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2008-12-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/11/2009 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 05/15/2009 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2009-05-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/22/2009 03:00:00 PM.
Date: 2009-05-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 08/21/2009 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2009-08-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 10/02/2009 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2009-10-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 10/05/2009 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2009-10-05T00:00:00Settlement Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/09/2010 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-55 Kenneth K. So.
Date: 2010-06-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/29/2010 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Settlement Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/12/2010 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-55 Kenneth K. So.
Date: 2010-01-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/15/2010 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2010-01-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 10/09/2009 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2009-10-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/25/2010 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2010-01-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/25/2010 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2010-01-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2010-01-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2010-02-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/22/2010 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2010-01-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 06/25/2010 09:00:00 AM.
Date: June 25, 2010Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2010-02-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 10/16/2009 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2009-10-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/27/2010 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2010-05-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 07/02/2010 09:45:00 AM.
Date: July 02, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.