Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Mortgage Services Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stebbins, Donald R, against Taylor, Elmer E, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Ronald S. Prager presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions74 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3311 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Contents as of 02/06/17 - volume 1 of 1 | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Default submitted by HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC returned per their request on 04/17/2008. | |
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC. Refers to: Taylor, Elmer | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | **Default received** | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service filed by HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC. | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC. Refers to: Taylor, Elmer | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC. Refers to: Taylor, Elmer | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Prager, Ronald.
Judge: Prager Ronald |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC. Refers to: Taylor, Elmer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.