Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cabrera, Maryann Camacho, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Ramsey, Shauntae, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Laura J. Birkmeyer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura J. Birkmeyer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time3304 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Contents as of 01/31/17 - volume 1 of 1 | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested denied with. | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order reassigned to for 02/04/2008 at 01:30:00 PM in S-09 at South County. | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 02/04/2008 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-09 . | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (unsuccessfull service) filed by Cabrera, Maryann Camacho. Refers to: Ramsey, Shauntae | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Case reassigned from Allard,Edward to Edwards,Raymond effective 01/24/2008 | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | The Court orders temporary restraining order granted as to Shauntae Ramsey. Hearing on Restraining Order set for 02/04/2008 at 01:30 PM before Laura J. Birkmeyer. All orders to remain in full force and effect pending date of hearing with a 100 yard stay away order. | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Orders to Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) filed by Cabrera, Maryann Camacho. | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Ex Parte scheduled for 01/17/2008 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-10 . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.