Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Unifund Ccr Partners; Aka : Assignee Of Palisades Collection Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Quall, Matthew W, against Padilla, Ruben H, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Joe O. Littlejohn presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions148 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3598 days |
Case reassigned from N-12 to N-03 effective 01/02/2009.
Date: 2009-01-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/27/2009 01:30:00 PM.
Date: March 27, 2009Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/06/2009 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-03 .
Date: 2009-01-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 03/27/2009 10:00:00 AM.
Date: March 27, 2009Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/06/2009 09:00:00 AM.
Date: February 06, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.