We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lee, Andy ; Dba : Print Zone ,
filed a(n)
General Small Claims -
Small Claims
case
against
Bass, Sonni ; Dba : Capriccio Salon ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
December 31, 2008
Last Refreshed
November 07, 2020
Practice Area
Small Claims
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
41 days
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Plaintiffs
Lee, Andy ; Dba : Print Zone
Defendants
Bass, Sonni ; Dba : Capriccio Salon
Case Events for
Lee, Andy ; Dba : Print Zone v. Bass, Sonni ; Dba : Capriccio Salon
Date
Type
Description
February 10, 2009
Docket Event
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 02/06/2009 08:15:00 AM.
Get Document
February 10, 2009
Docket Event
Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.
January 28, 2009
Docket Event
Request for Continuance of Small Claims Trial filed by Bass, Sonni.
January 08, 2009
Docket Event
Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Bass, Sonni.
December 31, 2008
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department N-11.
December 31, 2008
Docket Event
Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 02/06/2009 at 08:15:00 AM at North County in N-11 .
December 31, 2008
Docket Event
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Lee, Andy. Refers to: Bass, Sonni
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.