Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilson, Daniel, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Select University Technologies Inc, Macdougall, Kathy, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Joe O. Littlejohn presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 09, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Cycle Time443 days |
Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 08/25/2008 08:15:00 AM.
Date: 2008-08-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Appeal on Denial of Motion to Vacate heard 11/21/2008 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2008-11-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Appeal on Denial of Motion to Vacate heard 11/21/2008 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2008-12-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Small Claims) heard 02/02/2009 10:15:00 AM.
Date: February 03, 2009Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Small Claims) heard 09/24/2009 10:15:00 AM.
Date: September 25, 2009Minutes finalized for Motion to Vacate Judgment heard 10/15/2008 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2008-10-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.