We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Leite, Deborah ; Aka : Leite, Debby ,
filed a(n)
General Small Claims -
Small Claims
case
against
Kushner Dennis T & Laurie S Family Trust ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with Joe O. Littlejohn presiding.
Filing Date
January 18, 2008
Last Refreshed
November 07, 2020
Practice Area
Small Claims
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
103 days
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Plaintiffs
Leite, Deborah ; Aka : Leite, Debby
Defendants
Kushner Dennis T & Laurie S Family Trust
Case Events for
Leite, Deborah ; Aka : Leite, Debby v. Kushner Dennis T & Laurie S Family Trust
Date
Type
Description
April 30, 2008
Docket Event
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 04/25/2008 08:30:00 AM.
Get Document
April 30, 2008
Docket Event
Judgment entered.
April 28, 2008
Docket Event
Trial De Novo reassigned to Joe O. Littlejohn for 04/25/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in N-02 at North County.
April 28, 2008
Docket Event
Trial De Novo scheduled for 04/25/2008 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-02 Joe O. Littlejohn.
March 25, 2008
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing SD Trial De Novo scheduled for 04/25/2008 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-21 Joel M. Pressman.
Get Document
March 21, 2008
Docket Event
Notice Of Appeal (Small Claims) filed by Leite, Deborah. Refers to: Kushner Dennis T & Laurie S Family Trust
February 13, 2008
Docket Event
Defendants Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Kushner Dennis T. & Laurie S. Family Trust. Refers to: Leite, Deborah
January 28, 2008
Docket Event
Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Leite, Deborah. Refers to: Kushner Dennis T & Laurie S Family Trust
January 18, 2008
Docket Event
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Leite, Deborah.
January 18, 2008
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department N-11.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.