Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Granados, Flor, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Beach House Realty, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Ronald L. Styn presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2020 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions51 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Cycle Time141 days |
Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: May 21, 2009Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 05/08/2009 11:00:00 AM.
Date: May 08, 2009Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 02/20/2009 02:30:00 PM.
Date: February 20, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.