We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Armstrong, Rachard ,
filed a(n)
General Small Claims -
Small Claims
case
against
Us Airways ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
December 31, 2008
Last Refreshed
November 07, 2020
Practice Area
Small Claims
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
23 days
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Case Cycle Time
3288 days
Case Events for
Armstrong, Rachard v. Us Airways
Date
Type
Description
January 01, 2018
Docket Event
Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Armstrong, Rachard, on 12/31/2008, has expired.
January 26, 2009
Docket Event
Small Claims Court Trial reassigned to for 01/23/2009 at 08:15:00 AM in KM-A at Central.
January 23, 2009
Docket Event
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 01/23/2009 08:15:00 AM.
Get Document
January 23, 2009
Docket Event
Judgment entered.
January 23, 2009
Docket Event
Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 01/23/2009 at 08:15:00 AM at Central in KM-A .
December 31, 2008
Docket Event
Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 01/23/2009 at 08:15:00 AM at Central in KM-1 .
December 31, 2008
Docket Event
Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Armstrong, Rachard. Refers to: Armstrong, Rachard
December 31, 2008
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department KM-1.
December 31, 2008
Docket Event
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Armstrong, Rachard. Refers to: US Airways
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.