We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Zafra, Eilyn ,
filed a(n)
General Property -
Property
case
represented by
Kajtoch, James ,
against
Jouldjian, Kouren ,
Devera, Felros ; Esa : De Vera, Felrose ,
De Vera Jr, Feliciano ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with William R. Nevitt, Jr. presiding.
Judge
William R. Nevitt, Jr.
Filing Date
December 31, 2007
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
November 19, 2020
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Matter Type
General Property
Case Cycle Time
3654 days
Defendants
Devera, Felros ; Esa : De Vera, Felrose
Case Events for
Zafra, Eilyn v. Jouldjian, Kouren
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
January 01, 2018
Docket Event
Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by De Vera, Feliciano Jr, on 04/30/2008, has expired.
January 16, 2017
Docket Event
Case File Contents as of 01/09/17 - volume 1 of 1
December 18, 2008
Docket Event
Status of Mediation process changed to Mediation Not held on 08/15/2008.
November 18, 2008
Docket Event
Minute Order Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Get Document
November 13, 2008
Docket Event
Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 12/05/2008 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 William R. Nevitt was vacated.
November 13, 2008
Docket Event
Ex Parte scheduled for 11/06/2008 at 08:15:00 AM at Central in C-64 William R. Nevitt was vacated.
November 13, 2008
Docket Event
Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 11/14/2008 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-64 William R. Nevitt was vacated.
November 12, 2008
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Zafra, Eilyn.
November 04, 2008
Docket Event
Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - mediation did not take place filed by GNIATKOWSKI, THOMAS E..
October 30, 2008
Docket Event
Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed by Zafra, Eilyn.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.