Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Merrill, Ann K, against Garibay, David, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time3304 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Contents as of 01/09/17 - volume 1 of 1 | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | * Substitution of Attorney * | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed by Midland Funding, LLC. | |
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Midland Funding, LLC. Refers to: Garibay, David | |
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. | |
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Midland Funding, LLC. Refers to: Garibay, David | |
November 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ received | |
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event | The default filed by Midland Funding, LLC was entered as to Garibay, David on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used. | |
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Midland Funding, LLC. Refers to: Garibay, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.