We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Blagrove, Charles ,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Caruana, Mark V ,
against
Laws, Harry ,
Laws, Charles ,
Barondeau, Jacquelyn ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with David B. Oberholtzer presiding.
Judge
David B. Oberholtzer
Filing Date
December 31, 2007
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
November 19, 2020
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Case Cycle Time
3297 days
Case Events for
Blagrove, Charles v. Laws, Harry
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
January 09, 2017
Docket Event
Case File Contents as of 12/30/16 - volume 1 of 1
April 24, 2008
Docket Event
Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Blagrove, Charles. Refers to: Laws, Charles; Laws, Harry
March 27, 2008
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Blagrove, Charles.
February 04, 2008
Docket Event
Certificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (Granted) filed by Blagrove, Charles. Refers to: Laws, Harry
January 22, 2008
Docket Event
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from Cowett,Patricia to Oberholtzer,David effective 01/19/2008
Get Document
December 31, 2007
Docket Event
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cowett, Patricia.
Judge: Cowett Patricia
December 31, 2007
Docket Event
Summons Issued.
December 31, 2007
Docket Event
Complaint filed by Blagrove, Charles. Refers to: Laws, Charles; Laws, Harry; Barondeau, Jacquelyn
December 31, 2007
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Blagrove, Charles. Refers to: Laws, Charles; Laws, Harry; Barondeau, Jacquelyn
December 31, 2007
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by Blagrove, Charles. Refers to: Laws, Charles; Laws, Harry; Barondeau, Jacquelyn
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.