Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Molina, Ruby, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Marquez, Rosalinda, Cazares, Kenneth ; Aka : Cazares, Kenn, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Laura J. Birkmeyer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura J. Birkmeyer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions97 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Case Cycle Time3339 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Contents as of 02/14/17 - volume 1 of 1 | |
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Request for Orders to Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) dismissed with prejudice. | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed by Molina, Ruby. | |
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event | The Hearing on Restraining Order is scheduled for 04/02/2008 at 01:30 PM before S-09. | |
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order reassigned to for 03/18/2008 at 12:00:00 AM in S-14 at South County. | |
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/18/2008 at 12:00:00 AM at South County in S-14 . | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Case reassigned from Allard,Edward to Edwards,Raymond effective 01/24/2008 | |
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order continued to 03/18/2008 at 01:30 PM before South County. | |
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed by Molina, Ruby. Refers to: Cazares, Kenneth | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Answer to Request for Orders to Stop Harassment filed by Cazares, Kenneth. Refers to: Molina, Ruby |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.