Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Matthews, Jacquelyn, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Elliott, Angel, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Laura J. Birkmeyer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura J. Birkmeyer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 12, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time3400 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Contents as of 01/31/17 - volume 1 of 1 | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Case reassigned from Allard,Edward to Edwards,Raymond effective 01/24/2008 | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Allard, Edward.
Judge: Allard Edward |
|
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Ex Parte scheduled for 10/12/2007 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-15 Laura J. Birkmeyer. | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Request for Orders to Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) filed by Matthews, Jacquelyn on 10/12/2007. Refers to: Rosales, David; Matthews, Andres; Elliott, Angel | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Matthews, Jacquelyn on 10/12/2007. Refers to: Rosales, David; Matthews, Andres; Elliott, Angel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.