Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bassham, Solveig K, Bassham, David M, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Cluff, Leslie K, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions101 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time102 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Bassham, David M; Bassham, Solveig K. Refers to: Cluff, Leslie | |
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. | |
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Bassham, David M; Bassham, Solveig K. Refers to: Cluff, Leslie | |
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Bassham, David M; Bassham, Solveig K. Refers to: Cluff, Leslie | |
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Cluff, Leslie K on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Bassham,David M;Bassham,Solveig K . | |
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Bassham, David M; Bassham, Solveig K. | |
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of service by Posting(UD) filed by Bassham, David M. Refers to: Cluff, Leslie | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Order Allowing Service of Summons by Posting and Mailing filed by Bassham, David M; Bassham, Solveig K. | |
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing filed by Bassham, David M; Bassham, Solveig K. | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department E-01. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.