Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Estrella, Xavier, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Chatard, Chris M, against Easter, Cynthia, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time54 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Estrella, Xavier. Refers to: Easter, Cynthia | |
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. | |
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Entry of Judgment (AFTER TRIAL) filed by Estrella, Xavier; Easter, Cynthia on 11/15/2007. | |
November 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Estrella, Xavier on 11/01/2007. | |
November 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants filed by Estrella, Xavier on 11/01/2007. | |
November 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Estrella, Xavier on 11/01/2007. | |
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 11/15/2007 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-01 . | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Request to Set Case for Trial (At Issue Memorandum) filed by Estrella, Xavier on 10/30/2007. Refers to: Easter, Cynthia | |
October 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Easter, Cynthia on 10/19/2007. Refers to: Estrella, Xavier | |
October 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Easter, Cynthia on 10/18/2007. Refers to: Easter, Cynthia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.