Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rogers, Savannah Raycheal, Rogers, Charles Tyler Dean, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Begen, Loretta Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBegen, Loretta Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2010 |
CategoryGuardianship: Person/Relative |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Subsequent Petition Hearing | |
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Report | |
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Subsequent Petition Hearing | |
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Subsequent Petition Hearing | |
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
September 22, 2005 | Docket Event | Subsequent Petition Hearing | |
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Stat Closure: PR Permanent Letters Issued | |
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event | Subsequent Petition Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.