Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carter, Linda Diane, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Carter, Linda Lee, Carter, Larry D, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2010 |
CategoryOther Real Property: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Imaged File | |
November 30, 1996 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
November 30, 1995 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
November 30, 1995 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
November 30, 1995 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
October 18, 1995 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
December 09, 1994 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.