Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sanchez, Cesar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Demassa, Philip A., Esq., against Dhillon, Jaspreet Singh, Singh, Sohan, represented by Mayall, Hurley, Knutsen, Etal, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 1996 |
CategoryAuto Tort: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
May 23, 1996 | Docket Event | Civil Judgment | |
May 23, 1996 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
May 21, 1996 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 15, 1996 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
April 15, 1996 | Docket Event | Jury Trial After Evidence | |
April 12, 1996 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
April 11, 1996 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
April 10, 1996 | Docket Event | Jury Trial Assignment | |
April 09, 1996 | Docket Event | Jury Trial Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.