Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Deborah L Mccallister, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Kenneth J. Hara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2003 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Enforcement
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Cont Hrng and Extend Temps | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Enforcement
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Continue Hearing and Extend Temps (RFO) | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration (Respondent) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.