Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lam, Fei F., against Heather L Wachob A K A Heather Wachob A K A Heather Lee Wachob A K A Heather L. Galizia, John And Or Jane Doe 1 Through John And Or Jane Doe 12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint, United States Of America, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, represented by Cerrone, Michael Salvatore, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This legal document is a complaint filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC against Heather L. Wachob and other defendants. The complaint alleges that Heather L. Wachob failed to comply with the conditions of a note and mortgage, resulting in a balance ...
John And Or Jane Doe 1 Through John And Or Jane Doe 12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint
NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 15, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 24, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 04, 2024RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2024NOTICE
Date: January 11, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2023NOTICE
Date: January 11, 2024ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - a
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 04, 2024CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: December 15, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
January 11, 2024 | Notice of Foreclosure Settlement Conference | ||
January 11, 2024 |
NOTICE Residential Foreclosure Consumer Bill of Rights |
||
January 05, 2024 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
January 05, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 05, 2024 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a Exhibit to RJI - All Affidavits of Service |
||
January 04, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HEATHER WACHOB AFF |
||
January 04, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AFF |
||
January 04, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE/JANE DOE AFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.