Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Dlj Mortgage Capital, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by May, Ted E, against Cindy L. Newcomb A K A Cindy Newcomb, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Rt Max Development Inc., United States Of America, (total of 5) See All represented by Cerrone, Michael Salvatore, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by DL J Mortgage Capital, Inc. against Cindy L. Newcomb, also known as Cindy Newcomb, the New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Max Development Inc., United States of America, and fictitious a...
NOTICE
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 29, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: December 29, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 29, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 29, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 19, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 19, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: October 19, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2024 | Notice of Foreclosure Settlement Conference | ||
January 05, 2024 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Residential Foreclosure Consumer Bill of Rights |
||
December 29, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - RJI |
||
December 29, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
December 29, 2023 |
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI |
||
December 29, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION OCA AFF |
||
November 21, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CINDY L. NEWCOMB A/K/A CINDY NEWCOMB |
||
November 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
November 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (WESTERN DISTRICT) |
||
November 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (WESTERN DISTRICT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.